Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|