House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0857
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-014-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|