House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|