House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|