House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |