House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |