House | 11/12/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 10/29/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 10/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 10/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 10/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 10/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 10/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |