House | 03/29/2023 | Resolution Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |