1 | 1 | | HR0015LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r HR0015 LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
2 | 2 | | HR0015 LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 HOUSE RESOLUTION |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2 WHEREAS, Following World War II, the Soviet Union occupied |
---|
5 | 5 | | 3 Hungary and forced an anti-democratic and brutal government |
---|
6 | 6 | | 4 upon the people of Hungary; and |
---|
7 | 7 | | 5 WHEREAS, On October 23, 1956, over 100,000 ordinary |
---|
8 | 8 | | 6 citizens became "Freedom Fighters" and revolted against their |
---|
9 | 9 | | 7 Soviet communist government in what started as a peaceful |
---|
10 | 10 | | 8 protest but turned violent when protestors were fired upon by |
---|
11 | 11 | | 9 security police, triggering a bloody fight for freedom; and |
---|
12 | 12 | | 10 WHEREAS, The Soviet Union launched a military |
---|
13 | 13 | | 11 counter-offense to suppress the revolt, but not before |
---|
14 | 14 | | 12 thousands gave their lives for freedom; more than 200,000 |
---|
15 | 15 | | 13 Hungarians fled their country in the aftermath of the Soviet |
---|
16 | 16 | | 14 suppression of the Hungarian Uprising, and over 47,000 of |
---|
17 | 17 | | 15 these people eventually settled in the United States; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | 16 WHEREAS, On October 23, 1989, the Republic of Hungary |
---|
19 | 19 | | 17 declared its independence, which contributed to the collapse |
---|
20 | 20 | | 18 of the Soviet Union and communism in Eastern Europe; |
---|
21 | 21 | | 19 Hungarians led the first revolt against communist occupiers |
---|
22 | 22 | | 20 and inspired other captive nations to defend their freedom; |
---|
23 | 23 | | 21 and |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | HR0015 LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | HR0015- 2 -LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
31 | 31 | | HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
32 | 32 | | 1 WHEREAS, On March 12, 1999, Hungary became a member of |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2 NATO, and on May 1, 2004, Hungary become a member of the |
---|
34 | 34 | | 3 European Union; as a former Warsaw Pact nation, Hungary has |
---|
35 | 35 | | 4 proven itself as a reliable military ally in support against |
---|
36 | 36 | | 5 the global war on terrorism and as a provider of humanitarian |
---|
37 | 37 | | 6 aid in the pandemic fight against COVID-19; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | 7 WHEREAS, The State of Illinois is proud to be called home |
---|
39 | 39 | | 8 by a large number of Hungarians, Hungarian Americans, and |
---|
40 | 40 | | 9 their descendants, who have contributed greatly to the |
---|
41 | 41 | | 10 economic development, multicultural diversity, and enrichment |
---|
42 | 42 | | 11 of all aspects of life in the State; therefore, be it |
---|
43 | 43 | | 12 RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE |
---|
44 | 44 | | 13 HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that |
---|
45 | 45 | | 14 we recognize the 66th anniversary of the Hungarian Revolution |
---|
46 | 46 | | 15 and the sacrifices of the brave Hungarian freedom fighters and |
---|
47 | 47 | | 16 the great contributions of Hungarian-Americans in Illinois, |
---|
48 | 48 | | 17 and we reaffirm the friendship between the people and |
---|
49 | 49 | | 18 government of Illinois and the country of Hungary; and be it |
---|
50 | 50 | | 19 further |
---|
51 | 51 | | 20 RESOLVED, That we declare October 23, 2023 as "Hungarian |
---|
52 | 52 | | 21 Freedom Fighters Day" and declare October 2023 as "Hungarian |
---|
53 | 53 | | 22 Freedom Month" in the State of Illinois; and be it further |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | HR0015- 3 -LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
63 | 63 | | HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|
64 | 64 | | 1 RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be |
---|
65 | 65 | | 2 presented to Stephen Szigethy. |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r |
---|