Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HR0015 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/18/2023

                            HR0015LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r   HR0015  LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
  HR0015  LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
1  HOUSE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, Following World War II, the Soviet Union occupied
3  Hungary and forced an anti-democratic and brutal government
4  upon the people of Hungary; and
5  WHEREAS, On October 23, 1956, over 100,000 ordinary
6  citizens became "Freedom Fighters" and revolted against their
7  Soviet communist government in what started as a peaceful
8  protest but turned violent when protestors were fired upon by
9  security police, triggering a bloody fight for freedom; and
10  WHEREAS, The Soviet Union launched a military
11  counter-offense to suppress the revolt, but not before
12  thousands gave their lives for freedom; more than 200,000
13  Hungarians fled their country in the aftermath of the Soviet
14  suppression of the Hungarian Uprising, and over 47,000 of
15  these people eventually settled in the United States; and
16  WHEREAS, On October 23, 1989, the Republic of Hungary
17  declared its independence, which contributed to the collapse
18  of the Soviet Union and communism in Eastern Europe;
19  Hungarians led the first revolt against communist occupiers
20  and inspired other captive nations to defend their freedom;
21  and

 

  HR0015  LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r


HR0015- 2 -LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r   HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
  HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
1  WHEREAS, On March 12, 1999, Hungary became a member of
2  NATO, and on May 1, 2004, Hungary become a member of the
3  European Union; as a former Warsaw Pact nation, Hungary has
4  proven itself as a reliable military ally in support against
5  the global war on terrorism and as a provider of humanitarian
6  aid in the pandemic fight against COVID-19; and
7  WHEREAS, The State of Illinois is proud to be called home
8  by a large number of Hungarians, Hungarian Americans, and
9  their descendants, who have contributed greatly to the
10  economic development, multicultural diversity, and enrichment
11  of all aspects of life in the State; therefore, be it
12  RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE
13  HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that
14  we recognize the 66th anniversary of the Hungarian Revolution
15  and the sacrifices of the brave Hungarian freedom fighters and
16  the great contributions of Hungarian-Americans in Illinois,
17  and we reaffirm the friendship between the people and
18  government of Illinois and the country of Hungary; and be it
19  further
20  RESOLVED, That we declare October 23, 2023 as "Hungarian
21  Freedom Fighters Day" and declare October 2023 as "Hungarian
22  Freedom Month" in the State of Illinois; and be it further

 

 

  HR0015 - 2 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r


HR0015- 3 -LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r   HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
  HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r
1  RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be
2  presented to Stephen Szigethy.

 

 

  HR0015 - 3 - LRB103 25627 MST 51976 r