House | 05/18/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Resolution Adopted | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |