House | 04/30/2024 | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 12/20/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |