House | 05/23/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Resolution Adopted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |