1 | 1 | | HR0817LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r HR0817 LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
2 | 2 | | HR0817 LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 HOUSE RESOLUTION |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2 WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of |
---|
5 | 5 | | 3 Representatives wish to congratulate the Honorable Michael |
---|
6 | 6 | | 4 Christopher Fountain, Honorary Consul of the Consulate of the |
---|
7 | 7 | | 5 Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern |
---|
8 | 8 | | 6 United States, on the occasion of his decade of continued |
---|
9 | 9 | | 7 service; and |
---|
10 | 10 | | 8 WHEREAS, Consul Fountain, a Chicagoan from Chicago's West |
---|
11 | 11 | | 9 Side, possesses patrilineal descent to The Bahamas dating back |
---|
12 | 12 | | 10 to 1847 as a descendant of William Fountain; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | 11 WHEREAS, Consul Fountain was accredited by the U.S. |
---|
14 | 14 | | 12 Department of State as the first Honorary Consul of the |
---|
15 | 15 | | 13 Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern |
---|
16 | 16 | | 14 United States on March 6, 2014, becoming the second honorary |
---|
17 | 17 | | 15 consul of The Bahamas to ever be assigned and accredited by the |
---|
18 | 18 | | 16 United States; he opened the first Consulate of the |
---|
19 | 19 | | 17 Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago on September 5, 2014; |
---|
20 | 20 | | 18 and |
---|
21 | 21 | | 19 WHEREAS, Consul Fountain has conducted public diplomacy |
---|
22 | 22 | | 20 work to protect the interests of Bahamian nationals in the |
---|
23 | 23 | | 21 United States and to promote and engage interested parties in |
---|
24 | 24 | | 22 the specific matters of tourism, investment, trade, art, |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | HR0817 LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | |
---|
31 | 31 | | HR0817- 2 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
32 | 32 | | HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
33 | 33 | | 1 economic development, culture, science, agriculture, public |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2 safety, and the import and export of goods and services within |
---|
35 | 35 | | 3 his jurisdiction of the Midwestern United States, which |
---|
36 | 36 | | 4 includes Illinois, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Minnesota, Missouri, |
---|
37 | 37 | | 5 Nebraska, North Dakota, South Dakota, and Wisconsin; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | 6 WHEREAS, To further bilateral relationship opportunities |
---|
39 | 39 | | 7 between nations, Consul Fountain has engaged the |
---|
40 | 40 | | 8 administrations of the 41st, 42nd, and 43rd Governors of the |
---|
41 | 41 | | 9 State of Illinois, the 69th and 70th Speakers of the Illinois |
---|
42 | 42 | | 10 House of Representatives, the 38th and 39th Presidents of the |
---|
43 | 43 | | 11 Illinois Senate, and the 55th, 56th, and 57th Mayors of |
---|
44 | 44 | | 12 Chicago, and he has hosted The Bahamas' Minister of Foreign |
---|
45 | 45 | | 13 Affairs, its Parliamentary Secretary, its Ambassador and Head |
---|
46 | 46 | | 14 of Mission to the United States, its Deputy Chief of Mission to |
---|
47 | 47 | | 15 the United States, three consul generals of The Bahamas, and |
---|
48 | 48 | | 16 general manager of the Broadcast Corporation of The Bahamas |
---|
49 | 49 | | 17 for engagements in Illinois; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | 18 WHEREAS, To deepen the diplomatic engagement between the |
---|
51 | 51 | | 19 State of Illinois and the Commonwealth of The Bahamas, Consul |
---|
52 | 52 | | 20 Fountain has overseen numerous activities, including raising |
---|
53 | 53 | | 21 the first flag of The Bahamas over Illinois soil in |
---|
54 | 54 | | 22 acknowledgment of the first sanctioned Sister City |
---|
55 | 55 | | 23 relationship between Cat Island, Bahamas and Richton Park, |
---|
56 | 56 | | 24 Illinois and in celebration of the 43rd anniversary of |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
63 | 63 | | |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | HR0817- 3 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
66 | 66 | | HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
67 | 67 | | 1 Bahamian Independence on July 8, 2016, the first flag of The |
---|
68 | 68 | | 2 Bahamas at Chicago O'Hare International Airport in celebration |
---|
69 | 69 | | 3 of the 44th anniversary of Bahamian Independence on July 7, |
---|
70 | 70 | | 4 2017, and the first flag within Chicago city limits in |
---|
71 | 71 | | 5 celebration of the 48th anniversary of Bahamian Independence |
---|
72 | 72 | | 6 on July 9, 2021; he also organized and sponsored the first |
---|
73 | 73 | | 7 State visit of a sitting Prime Minister of The Bahamas to |
---|
74 | 74 | | 8 Chicago from September 10 to September 11, 2023, during which |
---|
75 | 75 | | 9 he facilitated the opportunity for Prime Minister Wendall K. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 10 Jones to speak at the City Club of Chicago; and |
---|
77 | 77 | | 11 WHEREAS, As a diplomatic representative of The Bahamas, |
---|
78 | 78 | | 12 Consul Fountain has also provided numerous support services to |
---|
79 | 79 | | 13 countless Bahamians in need of assistance, and he has |
---|
80 | 80 | | 14 previously led multistate awareness and relief efforts for |
---|
81 | 81 | | 15 Bahamians affected by Hurricanes Joaquin, Irma, Matthew, and |
---|
82 | 82 | | 16 Dorian; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | 17 WHEREAS, Consul Fountain has served with distinction as a |
---|
84 | 84 | | 18 member of the Board of Chancellors for the Consular Corps |
---|
85 | 85 | | 19 College, an association of foreign consuls in the United |
---|
86 | 86 | | 20 States based in Washington, D.C., and he is a member of the |
---|
87 | 87 | | 21 Chicago Consular Corps; and |
---|
88 | 88 | | 22 WHEREAS, As the longest-serving diplomatic representative |
---|
89 | 89 | | 23 of the Commonwealth of The Bahamas in the United States of |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | |
---|
92 | 92 | | |
---|
93 | 93 | | |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | HR0817- 4 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
99 | 99 | | HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|
100 | 100 | | 1 America, Consul Fountain now celebrates a decade of diplomacy, |
---|
101 | 101 | | 2 representing Bahamians in the Diaspora, within his |
---|
102 | 102 | | 3 jurisdiction of the Midwestern United States and the larger |
---|
103 | 103 | | 4 United States of America; therefore, be it |
---|
104 | 104 | | 5 RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE |
---|
105 | 105 | | 6 HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that |
---|
106 | 106 | | 7 we congratulate the Honorable Michael Christopher Fountain, |
---|
107 | 107 | | 8 Honorary Consul of the Consulate of the Commonwealth of The |
---|
108 | 108 | | 9 Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern United States, on |
---|
109 | 109 | | 10 serving as a crucial link to the bilateral relationship |
---|
110 | 110 | | 11 between The Bahamas and the United States for over a decade, |
---|
111 | 111 | | 12 and we wish him continued success while conducting his |
---|
112 | 112 | | 13 consular duties; and be it further |
---|
113 | 113 | | |
---|
114 | 114 | | |
---|
115 | 115 | | |
---|
116 | 116 | | |
---|
117 | 117 | | |
---|
118 | 118 | | HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r |
---|