Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HR0817 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/21/2024

                            HR0817LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r   HR0817  LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
  HR0817  LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
1  HOUSE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of
3  Representatives wish to congratulate the Honorable Michael
4  Christopher Fountain, Honorary Consul of the Consulate of the
5  Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern
6  United States, on the occasion of his decade of continued
7  service; and
8  WHEREAS, Consul Fountain, a Chicagoan from Chicago's West
9  Side, possesses patrilineal descent to The Bahamas dating back
10  to 1847 as a descendant of William Fountain; and
11  WHEREAS, Consul Fountain was accredited by the U.S.
12  Department of State as the first Honorary Consul of the
13  Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern
14  United States on March 6, 2014, becoming the second honorary
15  consul of The Bahamas to ever be assigned and accredited by the
16  United States; he opened the first Consulate of the
17  Commonwealth of The Bahamas in Chicago on September 5, 2014;
18  and
19  WHEREAS, Consul Fountain has conducted public diplomacy
20  work to protect the interests of Bahamian nationals in the
21  United States and to promote and engage interested parties in
22  the specific matters of tourism, investment, trade, art,

 

  HR0817  LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r


HR0817- 2 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r   HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
  HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
1  economic development, culture, science, agriculture, public
2  safety, and the import and export of goods and services within
3  his jurisdiction of the Midwestern United States, which
4  includes Illinois, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Minnesota, Missouri,
5  Nebraska, North Dakota, South Dakota, and Wisconsin; and
6  WHEREAS, To further bilateral relationship opportunities
7  between nations, Consul Fountain has engaged the
8  administrations of the 41st, 42nd, and 43rd Governors of the
9  State of Illinois, the 69th and 70th Speakers of the Illinois
10  House of Representatives, the 38th and 39th Presidents of the
11  Illinois Senate, and the 55th, 56th, and 57th Mayors of
12  Chicago, and he has hosted The Bahamas' Minister of Foreign
13  Affairs, its Parliamentary Secretary, its Ambassador and Head
14  of Mission to the United States, its Deputy Chief of Mission to
15  the United States, three consul generals of The Bahamas, and
16  general manager of the Broadcast Corporation of The Bahamas
17  for engagements in Illinois; and
18  WHEREAS, To deepen the diplomatic engagement between the
19  State of Illinois and the Commonwealth of The Bahamas, Consul
20  Fountain has overseen numerous activities, including raising
21  the first flag of The Bahamas over Illinois soil in
22  acknowledgment of the first sanctioned Sister City
23  relationship between Cat Island, Bahamas and Richton Park,
24  Illinois and in celebration of the 43rd anniversary of

 

 

  HR0817 - 2 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r


HR0817- 3 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r   HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
  HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
1  Bahamian Independence on July 8, 2016, the first flag of The
2  Bahamas at Chicago O'Hare International Airport in celebration
3  of the 44th anniversary of Bahamian Independence on July 7,
4  2017, and the first flag within Chicago city limits in
5  celebration of the 48th anniversary of Bahamian Independence
6  on July 9, 2021; he also organized and sponsored the first
7  State visit of a sitting Prime Minister of The Bahamas to
8  Chicago from September 10 to September 11, 2023, during which
9  he facilitated the opportunity for Prime Minister Wendall K.
10  Jones to speak at the City Club of Chicago; and
11  WHEREAS, As a diplomatic representative of The Bahamas,
12  Consul Fountain has also provided numerous support services to
13  countless Bahamians in need of assistance, and he has
14  previously led multistate awareness and relief efforts for
15  Bahamians affected by Hurricanes Joaquin, Irma, Matthew, and
16  Dorian; and
17  WHEREAS, Consul Fountain has served with distinction as a
18  member of the Board of Chancellors for the Consular Corps
19  College, an association of foreign consuls in the United
20  States based in Washington, D.C., and he is a member of the
21  Chicago Consular Corps; and
22  WHEREAS, As the longest-serving diplomatic representative
23  of the Commonwealth of The Bahamas in the United States of

 

 

  HR0817 - 3 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r


HR0817- 4 -LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r   HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
  HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r
1  America, Consul Fountain now celebrates a decade of diplomacy,
2  representing Bahamians in the Diaspora, within his
3  jurisdiction of the Midwestern United States and the larger
4  United States of America; therefore, be it
5  RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE
6  HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that
7  we congratulate the Honorable Michael Christopher Fountain,
8  Honorary Consul of the Consulate of the Commonwealth of The
9  Bahamas in Chicago for the Midwestern United States, on
10  serving as a crucial link to the bilateral relationship
11  between The Bahamas and the United States for over a decade,
12  and we wish him continued success while conducting his
13  consular duties; and be it further

 

 

  HR0817 - 4 - LRB103 40803 LAW 73679 r