Illinois 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HR0873 Introduced / Bill

Filed 08/02/2024

                    HR0873LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r   HR0873  LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
  HR0873  LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
1  HOUSE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of
3  Representatives are saddened to learn of the death of James M.
4  "Jim" Kelly Sr., who passed away on May 30, 2024; and
5  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, a World War II veteran and Urbana
6  firefighter, gave his entire life to public service for his
7  local community and county; and
8  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, one of nine children, was born to
9  Timothy Milton Kelly and Ruth Blythe Frazier Kelly in Findlay
10  on December 29, 1921; the family moved to Urbana in 1925; and
11  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly graduated from Urbana High School in
12  1940 and started working for the P & E Railroad Company;
13  however, with the United States' entry into World War II in
14  1941, he immediately registered for the draft but was denied
15  due to his job being declared essential; and
16  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly petitioned the railroad company to
17  release him multiple times throughout the war, and on January
18  1, 1944, he was officially released and eligible to register
19  for the draft, which he gladly did; and
20  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly married his high school sweetheart,

 

  HR0873  LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r


HR0873- 2 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r   HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
  HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
1  Leila Mae Roughton, on July 8, 1944 in Los Angeles, California
2  prior to beginning his service; and
3  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly affectionately called Leila his "Rosie
4  the Riveter" because she worked on the assembly line
5  manufacturing airplanes to be used in the war while waiting
6  for him to return home; and
7  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly joined the United States Marine Corps
8  and was stationed at Camp Pendleton, California, where he was
9  assigned to the Fifth Service Battalion, 28th Marine Regiment
10  of the 5th Marine Division, with the next stop being the Battle
11  of Iwo Jima; and
12  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly fought valiantly for his country for
13  the entire 36-day battle; he sadly lost his close friend and
14  fellow Urbana High School classmate, Richard L. Pittman, on
15  February 21, 1945 and three of his service battalion buddies
16  in the battle when they were hit by a mortar round as the four
17  of them were delivering ammunitions and supplies to the front;
18  and
19  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly returned home to Urbana on May 10, 1946
20  and began his career and family, welcoming a daughter, Cheryl
21  Ann "CJ" Johnson, and a son, James Milton Kelly II; and

 

 

  HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r


HR0873- 3 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r   HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
  HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
1  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly and Leila retired and eventually became
2  snowbirds, staying in the Tropic Isles Mobile Home Park in
3  Palmetto, Florida from November to April; and
4  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's fondest memories throughout his life
5  were caddying for Horton Smith, the first Master's champion,
6  in 1932, and getting a beer from his favorite actor, John
7  Wayne, at Laguna Beach, California; and
8  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was a strong supporter of the World War
9  II Memorial in Washington, D.C. and The National World War II
10  Museum in New Orleans and a lifetime member of the VFW,
11  American Legion, Masons, and the Marine Corps League; he also
12  belonged to the Elks Club for 40 years; and
13  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly has been recognized for various
14  accomplishments by State Senator Stan Weaver, U.S.
15  Representative Tim Johnson, Governor Dwight Green, Governor
16  James Thompson, Governor George Ryan, Secretary of State Jesse
17  White, President Donald Trump, and President Joe Biden; and
18  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was preceded in death by his wife of 66
19  years, Leila; his parents; his brothers, Elston Ward, Walter
20  Kendall, Paul Tyrus, and Robert Walker; his sisters, Ola
21  Margorine, Ione Imogene, Eleanor Ruth, and Marjoorie Geneese;
22  his son-in-law, Ken Johnson; and his daughter in-law, Anita

 

 

  HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r


HR0873- 4 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r   HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
  HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r
1  Morris; and
2  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly is survived by his children, Cheryl Ann
3  "CJ" Johnson and James Milton Kelly II; his grandchildren,
4  Kelly (Eric) Johnson, Kevin (Brandon) Bowersox-Johnson, Jaime
5  Hagg, and Kathrine (Erik) Hagerman; and his
6  great-grandchildren, Abigayl, Parker, Bryce, Samantha,
7  Garrett, Aneela, and Erik Jr.; and
8  WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's service and dedication will be
9  remembered by all who knew and loved him as we sadly lose
10  another hero from the World War II generation; therefore, be
11  it
12  RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE
13  HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that
14  we mourn the passing of James M. "Jim" Kelly Sr. and extend our
15  sincere condolences to his family, friends, and all who knew
16  and loved him; and be it further

 

 

  HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r