HR0873LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r 1 HOUSE RESOLUTION 2 WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of 3 Representatives are saddened to learn of the death of James M. 4 "Jim" Kelly Sr., who passed away on May 30, 2024; and 5 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, a World War II veteran and Urbana 6 firefighter, gave his entire life to public service for his 7 local community and county; and 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, one of nine children, was born to 9 Timothy Milton Kelly and Ruth Blythe Frazier Kelly in Findlay 10 on December 29, 1921; the family moved to Urbana in 1925; and 11 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly graduated from Urbana High School in 12 1940 and started working for the P & E Railroad Company; 13 however, with the United States' entry into World War II in 14 1941, he immediately registered for the draft but was denied 15 due to his job being declared essential; and 16 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly petitioned the railroad company to 17 release him multiple times throughout the war, and on January 18 1, 1944, he was officially released and eligible to register 19 for the draft, which he gladly did; and 20 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly married his high school sweetheart, HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873- 2 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r 1 Leila Mae Roughton, on July 8, 1944 in Los Angeles, California 2 prior to beginning his service; and 3 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly affectionately called Leila his "Rosie 4 the Riveter" because she worked on the assembly line 5 manufacturing airplanes to be used in the war while waiting 6 for him to return home; and 7 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly joined the United States Marine Corps 8 and was stationed at Camp Pendleton, California, where he was 9 assigned to the Fifth Service Battalion, 28th Marine Regiment 10 of the 5th Marine Division, with the next stop being the Battle 11 of Iwo Jima; and 12 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly fought valiantly for his country for 13 the entire 36-day battle; he sadly lost his close friend and 14 fellow Urbana High School classmate, Richard L. Pittman, on 15 February 21, 1945 and three of his service battalion buddies 16 in the battle when they were hit by a mortar round as the four 17 of them were delivering ammunitions and supplies to the front; 18 and 19 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly returned home to Urbana on May 10, 1946 20 and began his career and family, welcoming a daughter, Cheryl 21 Ann "CJ" Johnson, and a son, James Milton Kelly II; and HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873- 3 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r 1 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly and Leila retired and eventually became 2 snowbirds, staying in the Tropic Isles Mobile Home Park in 3 Palmetto, Florida from November to April; and 4 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's fondest memories throughout his life 5 were caddying for Horton Smith, the first Master's champion, 6 in 1932, and getting a beer from his favorite actor, John 7 Wayne, at Laguna Beach, California; and 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was a strong supporter of the World War 9 II Memorial in Washington, D.C. and The National World War II 10 Museum in New Orleans and a lifetime member of the VFW, 11 American Legion, Masons, and the Marine Corps League; he also 12 belonged to the Elks Club for 40 years; and 13 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly has been recognized for various 14 accomplishments by State Senator Stan Weaver, U.S. 15 Representative Tim Johnson, Governor Dwight Green, Governor 16 James Thompson, Governor George Ryan, Secretary of State Jesse 17 White, President Donald Trump, and President Joe Biden; and 18 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was preceded in death by his wife of 66 19 years, Leila; his parents; his brothers, Elston Ward, Walter 20 Kendall, Paul Tyrus, and Robert Walker; his sisters, Ola 21 Margorine, Ione Imogene, Eleanor Ruth, and Marjoorie Geneese; 22 his son-in-law, Ken Johnson; and his daughter in-law, Anita HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873- 4 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r 1 Morris; and 2 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly is survived by his children, Cheryl Ann 3 "CJ" Johnson and James Milton Kelly II; his grandchildren, 4 Kelly (Eric) Johnson, Kevin (Brandon) Bowersox-Johnson, Jaime 5 Hagg, and Kathrine (Erik) Hagerman; and his 6 great-grandchildren, Abigayl, Parker, Bryce, Samantha, 7 Garrett, Aneela, and Erik Jr.; and 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's service and dedication will be 9 remembered by all who knew and loved him as we sadly lose 10 another hero from the World War II generation; therefore, be 11 it 12 RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE 13 HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that 14 we mourn the passing of James M. "Jim" Kelly Sr. and extend our 15 sincere condolences to his family, friends, and all who knew 16 and loved him; and be it further HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r