1 | 1 | | HR0873LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
2 | 2 | | HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 HOUSE RESOLUTION |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2 WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of |
---|
5 | 5 | | 3 Representatives are saddened to learn of the death of James M. |
---|
6 | 6 | | 4 "Jim" Kelly Sr., who passed away on May 30, 2024; and |
---|
7 | 7 | | 5 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, a World War II veteran and Urbana |
---|
8 | 8 | | 6 firefighter, gave his entire life to public service for his |
---|
9 | 9 | | 7 local community and county; and |
---|
10 | 10 | | 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly, one of nine children, was born to |
---|
11 | 11 | | 9 Timothy Milton Kelly and Ruth Blythe Frazier Kelly in Findlay |
---|
12 | 12 | | 10 on December 29, 1921; the family moved to Urbana in 1925; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | 11 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly graduated from Urbana High School in |
---|
14 | 14 | | 12 1940 and started working for the P & E Railroad Company; |
---|
15 | 15 | | 13 however, with the United States' entry into World War II in |
---|
16 | 16 | | 14 1941, he immediately registered for the draft but was denied |
---|
17 | 17 | | 15 due to his job being declared essential; and |
---|
18 | 18 | | 16 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly petitioned the railroad company to |
---|
19 | 19 | | 17 release him multiple times throughout the war, and on January |
---|
20 | 20 | | 18 1, 1944, he was officially released and eligible to register |
---|
21 | 21 | | 19 for the draft, which he gladly did; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | 20 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly married his high school sweetheart, |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | HR0873 LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | HR0873- 2 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
30 | 30 | | HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
31 | 31 | | 1 Leila Mae Roughton, on July 8, 1944 in Los Angeles, California |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2 prior to beginning his service; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | 3 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly affectionately called Leila his "Rosie |
---|
34 | 34 | | 4 the Riveter" because she worked on the assembly line |
---|
35 | 35 | | 5 manufacturing airplanes to be used in the war while waiting |
---|
36 | 36 | | 6 for him to return home; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | 7 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly joined the United States Marine Corps |
---|
38 | 38 | | 8 and was stationed at Camp Pendleton, California, where he was |
---|
39 | 39 | | 9 assigned to the Fifth Service Battalion, 28th Marine Regiment |
---|
40 | 40 | | 10 of the 5th Marine Division, with the next stop being the Battle |
---|
41 | 41 | | 11 of Iwo Jima; and |
---|
42 | 42 | | 12 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly fought valiantly for his country for |
---|
43 | 43 | | 13 the entire 36-day battle; he sadly lost his close friend and |
---|
44 | 44 | | 14 fellow Urbana High School classmate, Richard L. Pittman, on |
---|
45 | 45 | | 15 February 21, 1945 and three of his service battalion buddies |
---|
46 | 46 | | 16 in the battle when they were hit by a mortar round as the four |
---|
47 | 47 | | 17 of them were delivering ammunitions and supplies to the front; |
---|
48 | 48 | | 18 and |
---|
49 | 49 | | 19 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly returned home to Urbana on May 10, 1946 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 20 and began his career and family, welcoming a daughter, Cheryl |
---|
51 | 51 | | 21 Ann "CJ" Johnson, and a son, James Milton Kelly II; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | HR0873 - 2 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | HR0873- 3 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
61 | 61 | | HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
62 | 62 | | 1 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly and Leila retired and eventually became |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2 snowbirds, staying in the Tropic Isles Mobile Home Park in |
---|
64 | 64 | | 3 Palmetto, Florida from November to April; and |
---|
65 | 65 | | 4 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's fondest memories throughout his life |
---|
66 | 66 | | 5 were caddying for Horton Smith, the first Master's champion, |
---|
67 | 67 | | 6 in 1932, and getting a beer from his favorite actor, John |
---|
68 | 68 | | 7 Wayne, at Laguna Beach, California; and |
---|
69 | 69 | | 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was a strong supporter of the World War |
---|
70 | 70 | | 9 II Memorial in Washington, D.C. and The National World War II |
---|
71 | 71 | | 10 Museum in New Orleans and a lifetime member of the VFW, |
---|
72 | 72 | | 11 American Legion, Masons, and the Marine Corps League; he also |
---|
73 | 73 | | 12 belonged to the Elks Club for 40 years; and |
---|
74 | 74 | | 13 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly has been recognized for various |
---|
75 | 75 | | 14 accomplishments by State Senator Stan Weaver, U.S. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 15 Representative Tim Johnson, Governor Dwight Green, Governor |
---|
77 | 77 | | 16 James Thompson, Governor George Ryan, Secretary of State Jesse |
---|
78 | 78 | | 17 White, President Donald Trump, and President Joe Biden; and |
---|
79 | 79 | | 18 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly was preceded in death by his wife of 66 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 19 years, Leila; his parents; his brothers, Elston Ward, Walter |
---|
81 | 81 | | 20 Kendall, Paul Tyrus, and Robert Walker; his sisters, Ola |
---|
82 | 82 | | 21 Margorine, Ione Imogene, Eleanor Ruth, and Marjoorie Geneese; |
---|
83 | 83 | | 22 his son-in-law, Ken Johnson; and his daughter in-law, Anita |
---|
84 | 84 | | |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | |
---|
89 | 89 | | HR0873 - 3 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | |
---|
92 | 92 | | HR0873- 4 -LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
93 | 93 | | HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|
94 | 94 | | 1 Morris; and |
---|
95 | 95 | | 2 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly is survived by his children, Cheryl Ann |
---|
96 | 96 | | 3 "CJ" Johnson and James Milton Kelly II; his grandchildren, |
---|
97 | 97 | | 4 Kelly (Eric) Johnson, Kevin (Brandon) Bowersox-Johnson, Jaime |
---|
98 | 98 | | 5 Hagg, and Kathrine (Erik) Hagerman; and his |
---|
99 | 99 | | 6 great-grandchildren, Abigayl, Parker, Bryce, Samantha, |
---|
100 | 100 | | 7 Garrett, Aneela, and Erik Jr.; and |
---|
101 | 101 | | 8 WHEREAS, Jim Kelly's service and dedication will be |
---|
102 | 102 | | 9 remembered by all who knew and loved him as we sadly lose |
---|
103 | 103 | | 10 another hero from the World War II generation; therefore, be |
---|
104 | 104 | | 11 it |
---|
105 | 105 | | 12 RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE |
---|
106 | 106 | | 13 HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that |
---|
107 | 107 | | 14 we mourn the passing of James M. "Jim" Kelly Sr. and extend our |
---|
108 | 108 | | 15 sincere condolences to his family, friends, and all who knew |
---|
109 | 109 | | 16 and loved him; and be it further |
---|
110 | 110 | | |
---|
111 | 111 | | |
---|
112 | 112 | | |
---|
113 | 113 | | |
---|
114 | 114 | | |
---|
115 | 115 | | HR0873 - 4 - LRB103 41749 MST 74970 r |
---|