House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 047-006-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|