Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0057
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-015-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|