Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0369
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-011-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|