Senate | 06/26/2024 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/25/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | To Subcommittee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Re-assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |