Senate | 04/20/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |