Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
To Subcommittee on Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|