Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0069
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-017-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 042-014-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 010-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|