Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0876
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 042-016-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|