House
|
11/21/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|