Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0545
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 017-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|