House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|