Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0074
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|