Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0576
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date December 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|