Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0374
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|