House
|
11/26/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
11/26/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|