Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Joyce | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 008-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |