Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |