Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0489
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|