Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0381
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 035-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-030-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Gaming Committee; 010-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Gaming Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Gaming Committee; 010-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Gaming Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|