Senate | 03/17/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Postponed - Education | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |