Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0093
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|