Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0491
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 042-011-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Postponed - Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|