Senate | 02/01/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Re-assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |