Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0494
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Postponed - Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|