Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0223
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-023-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Glowiak-Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|