Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | To Subcommittee on Gaming, Wagering, and Racing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |