Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0228
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|