Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Directed to Multiple Committees Environment & Conservation, Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|