Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0464
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|