Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0390
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|