Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0238
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|