Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0241
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|